RI S2634 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal The Current § 11-52-4.2 (“Cyberstalking and Cyberharassment Prohibited”) and create § 11-52-4.4 (“Cyberstalking and Harassment Prohibited”) to prohibit an intentional act or acts that serve no legitimate purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Computer Crime

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-03-11SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014)
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback