RI S2602 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify the criminal offense of human trafficking. This act would also revise the procedures governing forfeitures of proceeds seized from human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trafficking Of Persons And Involuntary Servitude

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-05SenateReferred to House Judiciary
2014-06-05SenateSenate read and passed
2014-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014)
2014-05-15SenateCommittee recommends passage
2014-05-12SenateScheduled for consideration (05/15/2014)
2014-03-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-03-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2014)
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback