RI S2480 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the process for submission of economic impact statements, and eliminate a number of exclusions which are set forth in the existing statute.
Title
Regulatory Fairness In Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to House Committee on Small Business |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/06/2014) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Commerce |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |