RI S2425 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Feasibility Of Establishing A Desert Storm And Desert Shield Memorial At The Rhode Island Veterans' Cemetery (creates A Nine (9) Member Commission Regarding Establishing A Desert Storm And Desert Shield Memorial At The Rhode Island Veterans’ Cemetery, And Report To The General Assembly On Or Before March 4, 2015 And Commission Would Expire July 1, 2015.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Feasibility Of Establishing A Desert Storm And Desert Shield Memorial At The Rhode Island Veterans' Cemetery (creates A Nine (9) Member Commission Regarding Establishing A Desert Storm And Desert Shield Memorial At The Rhode Island Veterans’ Cemetery, And Report To The General Assembly On Or Before March 4, 2015 And Commission Would Expire July 1, 2015.)
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |