RI S2423 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add the adjutant general of the Rhode Island National Guard or his or her designee as a member of the Rhode Island Veterans' services strategic plan advisory committee.
Title
Veterans' Affairs
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-05-13 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (05/13/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |