RI S2335 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a new method to fund transportation and bridge costs in RI. The act would establish the RI transportation infrastructure fund as a restricted receipt account within the RI intermodal surface transportation fund
Title
Rhode Island Transportation Infrastructure Fund -- Creation -- Allocations To Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2014) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |