RI S2181 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require teachers and school nurses to complete a low or no cost training course and an annual refresher course in concussions and traumatic brain injuries.
Title
School And Youth Programs Concussion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |