RI S2035 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Robert J. Skinner, Esq., to join Tyler R. Lewis, Esq., and Sarah H. Montgomery, Esq., in marriage on or about June 28, 2014, within the Town of Little Compton, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-04-03 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/03/2014) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/25/2014) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/12/2014) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2014) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |