RI S0683 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Employment Security-contributions
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Employment Security-contributions
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-18 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2013) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to House Labor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/22/2013) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0683.pdf |