RI H8271 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Nefl, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Nefl, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-04 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |