RI H8227 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Office Of Energy Resources To Issue A Report Describing Its Findings And Recommendations On The State's Energy Security And Improvement Opportunities
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Office Of Energy Resources To Issue A Report Describing Its Findings And Recommendations On The State's Energy Security And Improvement Opportunities
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |