RI H7974 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Title
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-04 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2014-05-20 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/20/2014) |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2014) |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |