RI H7699 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permit the cities or towns to establish tax exemptions for industrial and commercial property.
Title
Manufacturing And Commercial Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Donna Walsh [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7699.pdf |