RI H7578 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require that for school bus transportation provided to children enrolled in grades kindergarten through six (6), a parent, guardian or authorized person be present at the child’s designated bus stops.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7578.pdf |