RI H7520 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the process for submission of economic impact statements, and eliminate a number of exclusions which are set forth in the existing statute
Title
Regulatory Fairness In Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2014-05-21 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee continued |
2014-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |