RI H7308 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grant judges and magistrates the authority to prohibit drivers adjudicated of certain motor vehicle offenses from operating a motor vehicle not equipped with an ignition interlock system
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7308.pdf |