RI H7178 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a plan for the gradual ban on the use of disposable plastic checkout bags by retail establishments
Title
Plastic Waste Reduction
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Donna Walsh [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-02-03 | House | Meeting postponed (02/06/2014) |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7178.pdf |