RI H7171 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enable the general assembly in grand committee to fill a vacancy in the office of the lieutenant governor
Title
General State Officers
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-22 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-02-04 | House | Meeting postponed (02/05/2014) |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |