RI H7042 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Update and refine the definition section in the statutes on food, drugs, and cosmetics, most notable a new definition for genetically engineered products. It would also set forth rules for labeling such products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Food Drugs & Cosmetics Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2014)
2014-01-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-01-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2014)
2014-01-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback