RI H7027 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Put a weight restriction on certain large vehicles traveling in and around the area surrounding the North Smithfield Town Hall
Title
Size, Weight, And Load Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2014-03-13 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-03-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/13/2014) |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/06/2014) |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2014) |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |