RI H5720 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Corporations, Associations And Partnerships (would Allow For The Creation Of Benefit Corporations.)
Title
An Act Relating To Corporations, Associations And Partnerships (would Allow For The Creation Of Benefit Corporations.)
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2013-07-02 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-07-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-07-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-07-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/02/2013) |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5720.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5720aa.pdf |