PA SR430 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-20 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-20 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the President and the Congress of the United States to publicly denounce the crimes against humanity occurring in Iraq and to take prudent action to protect Iraqi Christians and other religious minorities from persecution from the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant.
Title
Urging the President and the Congress of the United States to publicly denounce the crimes against humanity occurring in Iraq and to take prudent action to protect Iraqi Christians and other religious minorities from persecution from the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-20 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-09-12 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |