PA SR340 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to reauthorize Federally provided terrorism reinsurance for insurers.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to reauthorize Federally provided terrorism reinsurance for insurers.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. Mike Stack [D] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Timothy Solobay [D] |
Rep. Matthew Smith [D] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |