PA SR325 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating May 7, 2014, as "Pennsylvania Health Care Information Technology Awareness Day."
Title
Designating May 7, 2014, as "Pennsylvania Health Care Information Technology Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |