PA SR304 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study of the Juvenile Act and related issues.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study of the Juvenile Act and related issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Mike Stack [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |