PA SB984 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 53 (Municipalities Generally), 66 (Public Utilities) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in taxicabs and limousines in first class cities, further providing for definitions and for certificate of public convenience required; providing for transportation network companies and for regulation of taxicabs and limousines in cities of the first class; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties, providing for power of commission to confiscate, impound and sell vehicles; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; providing for motor carrier regulations and for transportation network service; and, in general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Title
In taxicabs and limousines in first class cities, further providing for definitions and for certificate of public convenience required; providing for transportation network companies and for regulation of taxicabs and limousines in cities of the first class; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties, providing for power of commission to confiscate, impound and sell vehicles; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; providing for motor carrier regulations and for transportation network service; and, in general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 984 PN 2167, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 2167, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9810, MAHER (Y: 52 N: 139 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9810, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 140 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A7707, DAVIDSON (Y: 55 N: 139 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10605, KINSEY (Y: 91 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9018, NEUMAN (Y: 61 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9810, MAHER (Y: 135 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9815, GABLER (Y: 115 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10579, SANTORA (Y: 187 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10589, SANTORA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10557, GODSHALL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07020 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 984 PN 1440, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 984 PN 1374, A4486, BARTOLOTTA AMENDMENT NO. A-4486 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 984 PN 2167, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 2167, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9810, MAHER (Y: 52 N: 139 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9810, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 140 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A7707, DAVIDSON (Y: 55 N: 139 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10605, KINSEY (Y: 91 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9018, NEUMAN (Y: 61 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9810, MAHER (Y: 135 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A9815, GABLER (Y: 115 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10579, SANTORA (Y: 187 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10589, SANTORA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Floor: SB 984 PN 1753, 2015 A10557, GODSHALL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07020 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 984 PN 1440, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 984 PN 1374, A4486, BARTOLOTTA AMENDMENT NO. A-4486 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | Act No. 164 |
2016-11-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-1) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2016-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-18 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-10-17 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-21 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2015-11-24 | House | In the House |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-2) |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |