PA SB771 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for the State Geospatial Coordinating Board.
Title
Providing for the State Geospatial Coordinating Board.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Jim Ferlo [D] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 178 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-16 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-07-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-07-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-11 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2014-03-11 | House | In the House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |