PA SB738 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-13 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-13 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for distribution system extension and expansion plans to increase natural gas usage in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for distribution system extension and expansion plans to increase natural gas usage in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - SB 738 PN 1213, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - SB 738 PN 1146, A2126, TARTAGLIONE AMENDMENT NO. A-02126 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - SB 738 PN 1146, A2126, TARTAGLIONE AMENDMENT NO. A-02126 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2013-06-12 | House | In the House |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-2) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |