PA SB688 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of criminal trespass; defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; and prescribing penalties.
Title
Further providing for the offense of criminal trespass; defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; and prescribing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - Senate - SB 688 PN 672, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-29 | House | First consideration |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2013-10-22 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-05-06 | House | In the House |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |