PA SB491 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, providing for the definition of "farming"; further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes and for withholding and remittance; and providing for optional property tax elimination.
Title
Providing for the definition of "farming"; further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes and for withholding and remittance; and providing for optional property tax elimination.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-22 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2014-03-31 | House | In the House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |