PA SB405 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-06 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-06 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1976 (P.L.1163, No.259), referred to as the Generic Equivalent Drug Law, further providing for definitions, for substitutions, for posting requirements, for powers and duties of Department of Health and for immunity of pharmacists under certain circumstances.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for substitutions, for posting requirements, for powers and duties of Department of Health and for immunity of pharmacists under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-06-26 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2014-06-24 | House | In the House |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-6) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |