PA SB150 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases; providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions; further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis; providing for request for modified DNA search; and further providing for DNA data base exchange, for expungement and for mandatory cost.
Title
In DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases; providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions; further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis; providing for request for modified DNA search; and further providing for DNA data base exchange, for expungement and for mandatory cost.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - SB 150 PN 1243, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - SB 150 PN 1243, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - SB 150 PN 342, A2062, WILLIAMS AMENDMENT NO. A-2062 (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-17 - Senate - SB 150 PN 342, A2186, PILEGGI AMENDMENT NO. A-02186 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - SB 150 PN 1243, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - SB 150 PN 342, A2062, WILLIAMS AMENDMENT NO. A-2062 (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-17 - Senate - SB 150 PN 342, A2186, PILEGGI AMENDMENT NO. A-02186 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2014-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-07-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-07-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-16 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-28 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2013-11-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-06-18 | House | In the House |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Final passage (38-9) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-8) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |