PA SB1481 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, in residual waste, further providing for transportation of residual waste; and abrogating a regulation.
Title
In residual waste, further providing for transportation of residual waste; and abrogating a regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |