PA SB1441 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in bonds and recognizances, amending provisions relating to professional bondsmen; and providing for authorization to conduct business within each county, for forfeited undertaking and for private cause of action.
Title
In bonds and recognizances, amending provisions relating to professional bondsmen; and providing for authorization to conduct business within each county, for forfeited undertaking and for private cause of action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-07 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-10-07 | House | In the House |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |