PA SB1440 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 5, 2012 (P.L.1102, No.132), known as the State System of Higher Education Intellectual Property Act, further providing for title of act, for short title, for definitions and for repeal.
Title
Further providing for title of act, for short title, for definitions and for repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |