PA SB1373 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-25 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-25 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 12, 1931 (P.L.575, No.200), entitled "An act providing for joint action by Pennsylvania and New Jersey in the development of the ports on the lower Delaware River, and the improvement of the facilities for transportation across the river; authorizing the Governor, for these purposes, to enter into an agreement with New Jersey; creating The Delaware River Joint Commission and specifying the powers and duties thereof, including the power to finance projects by the issuance of revenue bonds; transferring to the new commission all the powers of the Delaware River Bridge Joint Commission; and making an appropriation," providing for gubernatorial veto.
Title
Amending the act of June 12, 1931 (P.L.575, No.200), entitled "An act providing for joint action by Pennsylvania and New Jersey in the development of the ports on the lower Delaware River, and the improvement of the facilities for transportation across the river; authorizing the Governor, for these purposes, to enter into an agreement with New Jersey; creating The Delaware River Joint Commission and specifying the powers and duties thereof, including the power to finance projects by the issuance of revenue bonds; transferring to the new commission all the powers of the Delaware River Bridge Joint Commission; and making an appropriation," providing for gubernatorial veto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-09-24 | House | In the House |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |