PA SB1357 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Corman [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] |
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Timothy Solobay [D] | Sen. Michael Brubaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 183 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | House | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2014-09-16 | House | In the House |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |