PA SB1302 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-16 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-16 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in creation, alteration and termination of planned communities, further providing for voting and proxies.
Title
In creation, alteration and termination of planned communities, further providing for voting and proxies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-07 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2014-10-14 | House | In the House |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Final passage (49-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |