PA SB1255 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for purposes and powers.
Title
In municipal authorities, further providing for purposes and powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 123 |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (178-25) |
2014-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-04-29 | House | In the House |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-04-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |