PA SB1207 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 25, 1973 (P.L.217, No.53), entitled "An act authorizing cities of the first class and second class to invest all funds received and deposited with the city treasurer in certain commercial paper under certain terms and conditions," providing for investment of public corporation or authority funds.
Title
Amending the act of July 25, 1973 (P.L.217, No.53), entitled "An act authorizing cities of the first class and second class to invest all funds received and deposited with the city treasurer in certain commercial paper under certain terms and conditions," providing for investment of public corporation or authority funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-10-14 | House | First consideration |
2014-10-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-06-24 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-06-23 | House | In the House |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |