PA SB1188 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-29 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-29 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1981 (P.L.435, No.135), known as the Race Horse Industry Reform Act, further providing for definitions; repealing provisions related to the State Horse Racing Commission and State Harness Racing Commission; and providing for racing oversight, for pari-mutuel wagering licensing and for advance deposit wagering; further providing for mandatory requirements for medication rules, for establishment of Pennsylvania Race Horse Testing Program, for costs for enforcement of medication rules; and providing for the cessation of the State Horse Racing Commission and the State Harness Racing Commission.
Title
Further providing for definitions; repealing provisions related to the State Horse Racing Commission and State Harness Racing Commission; and providing for racing oversight, for pari-mutuel wagering licensing and for advance deposit wagering; further providing for mandatory requirements for medication rules, for establishment of Pennsylvania Race Horse Testing Program, for costs for enforcement of medication rules; and providing for the cessation of the State Horse Racing Commission and the State Harness Racing Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-29 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2014-06-27 | House | In the House |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Re-committed to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-11-22 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |