PA SB1181 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in additional special funds, further providing for the Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund.
Title
In additional special funds, further providing for the Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Robert Tomlinson [R] |
Sen. Charles McIlhinney [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - SB 1181 PN 1650, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - SB 1181 PN 1650, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Act No. 30 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-03-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2014-03-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-12 | House | Second consideration |
2014-03-11 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-10 | House | First consideration |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2013-12-11 | House | In the House |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |