PA SB1167 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 23 (Domestic Relations) and 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction, for modification of existing orders and for child custody proceeding during military deployment; and providing for expedited or electronic hearing.
Title
Further providing for consideration of criminal conviction, for modification of existing orders and for child custody proceeding during military deployment; and providing for expedited or electronic hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - SB 1167 PN 1947, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - SB 1167 PN 1947, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - SB 1167 PN 1604, 2011 A8389, ROAE (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - Senate - SB 1167 PN 1604, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-20 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - SB 1167 PN 1947, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - SB 1167 PN 1604, 2011 A8389, ROAE (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - Senate - SB 1167 PN 1604, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-20 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Senate | Act No. 32 |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2012-03-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-03-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2012-03-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-02-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-02-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2012-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-01-24 | House | First consideration |
2012-01-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-10-03 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-09-28 | House | In the House |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-09-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |