PA SB1102 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for disabled veterans and former prisoners of war.
Title
Further providing for disabled veterans and former prisoners of war.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-21 - Senate - SB 1102 PN 1424, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-21 - Senate - SB 1102 PN 1424, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act No. 81 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-11 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-10-29 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2013-10-21 | House | In the House |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-10-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |