PA SB1085 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on July 1 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-07-23 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education; in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for definitions and for concurrent enrollment agreements; and extensively revising charter school provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education; in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for definitions and for concurrent enrollment agreements; and extensively revising charter school provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-11-19 - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-23HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2014-07-01HouseIn the House
2014-07-01SenateThird consideration and final passage (37-13)
2014-06-26SenateAmended on third consideration
2014-06-25SenateRemoved from table
2014-06-25SenateLaid on the table
2014-06-04SenateRemoved from table
2014-06-04SenateLaid on the table
2014-04-09SenateRemoved from table
2014-04-09SenateLaid on the table
2014-03-17SenateRemoved from table
2014-03-17SenateLaid on the table
2014-01-27SenateRemoved from table
2014-01-27SenateLaid on the table
2013-12-09SenateSecond consideration
2013-11-19SenateRe-reported as amended
2013-10-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-10-16SenateFirst consideration
2013-10-16SenateReported as amended
2013-08-27SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2013&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1085
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1085&pn=1356
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1085&pn=1488
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1085&pn=1597
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1085&pn=2212
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/16/2013&rNbr=515
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/19/2013&rNbr=598

Bill Comments

feedback