PA SB1000 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for rural regional community college for underserved counties.
Title
Providing for rural regional community college for underserved counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-03-19 | House | In the House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-4) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |