PA HR249 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution supporting continued and increased development and delivery of oil derived from North American oil reserves to American refineries and urging the President and Congress of the United States to support the continued and increased production and use of American natural gas.
Title
Supporting continued and increased development and delivery of oil derived from North American oil reserves to American refineries and urging the President and Congress of the United States to support the continued and increased production and use of American natural gas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-17 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-18 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-22 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |