PA HR13 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-29)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Adopted (195-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-29)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Adopted (195-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring the life and expressing condolences upon the death of Staff Sergeant Eric Holman, an American hero who paid the supreme sacrifice on August 15, 2012, while serving his country in Afghanistan.
Title
Honoring the life and expressing condolences upon the death of Staff Sergeant Eric Holman, an American hero who paid the supreme sacrifice on August 15, 2012, while serving his country in Afghanistan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - HR 13 PN 109 (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Adopted (195-0) |
2013-01-15 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 109 |
2013-01-14 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |