PA HB974 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, further providing for automated external defibrillators.
Title
In school health services, further providing for automated external defibrillators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 974 PN 2176, FP (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 974 PN 2176, FP (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-18 | House | Act No. 35 |
2014-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-04-09 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-04-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-04-07 | House | Signed in House |
2014-04-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-1) |
2014-04-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-04-02 | House | In the House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-10-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-10-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-2) |
2013-09-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-09-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-09-25 | House | Second consideration |
2013-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |