PA HB764 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-11)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-15 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-15 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving online impersonation.
Title
In sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving online impersonation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - HB 764 PN 1719, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - HB 764 PN 1719, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-15 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-10-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (195-0) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Final passage (44-6) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-05-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-05-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2013-05-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-13 | House | Second consideration |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |